AL HB236 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales tax exemptions, sales and use tax exemption provided for certain purchases of diapers, baby supplies, baby formula, maternity clothing, and menstrual hygiene products
Title
Taxation, sales tax exemptions, sales and use tax exemption provided for certain purchases of diapers, baby supplies, baby formula, maternity clothing, and menstrual hygiene products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Instrument Change 5PBJ666-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Instrument Change 5PBJ666-1 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment XHKIE7Z-1 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 252 |
2024-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 251 5PBJ666-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Ways and Means Education Engrossed Substitute Offered 5PBJ666-1 |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted 5PBJ666-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted 67WH1ZZ-1 |
2024-03-06 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-27 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |