AL HB236 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to Calhoun County; to authorize the sheriff and commissioner of licenses to obtain and use a credit card for official uses.
Title
Relating to Calhoun County; to authorize the sheriff and commissioner of licenses to obtain and use a credit card for official uses.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2023-04-18 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 84 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-04 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Local Legislation |
2023-04-19 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-18 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-18 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported Favorably from House Local Legislation |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Local Legislation |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |