AL HB236 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-26 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, students taught at home by either private tutor or under church school law may participate in public K-12 extracurricular activities, Tim Tebow Act
Title
Schools, students taught at home by either private tutor or under church school law may participate in public K-12 extracurricular activities, Tim Tebow Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 52 N: 43 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs with 1 amendment |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Education and Youth Affairs first Amendment Offered |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2015-05-07 | House | Buskey intended to vote "Nay" and Sells intended to vote "Abstain" |
2015-05-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 601 |
2015-05-07 | House | Henry motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Henry Amendment Offered |
2015-05-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-05 | House | Henry Amendment Offered |
2015-05-05 | House | Motion to Adopt pending |
2015-05-05 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |