AL HB235 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Travel insurance, Travel Insurance Act, created, licensing and registration requirements revised, sale of travel insurance, establish sales practices standards, Secs. 27-64-1 to 27-64-10, inclusive, added; Sec. 27-7-5.2 repealed
Title
Travel insurance, Travel Insurance Act, created, licensing and registration requirements revised, sale of travel insurance, establish sales practices standards, Secs. 27-64-1 to 27-64-10, inclusive, added; Sec. 27-7-5.2 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 517 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 516 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 201 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 200 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 516 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 201 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 200 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on March 10, 2022. |
2022-03-10 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-152. |
2022-03-10 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 517 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201 |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 64 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 64 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 7 | 5.2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |