AL HB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Animals, dogs, pet dog allowed in an outdoor dining area under certain conditions
Title
Animals, dogs, pet dog allowed in an outdoor dining area under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1450 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 1449 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 209 (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: McMillan motion to Adopt Roll Call 208 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Whatley motion to Adopt Roll Call 1449 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 209 (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: McMillan motion to Adopt Roll Call 208 (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-474. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1450 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2021-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 209 |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |