AL HB235 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor fuel tax, tax on fuels delivered to a destination in this state, Secs. 40-17-328 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor fuel tax, tax on fuels delivered to a destination in this state, Secs. 40-17-328 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateFinance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered
2016-05-04SenateFurther Consideration
2016-05-04SenatePittman motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-20SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 427
2016-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback