AL HB234 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Tourism first Amendment Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 1 municipality (B'ham), alcoholic beverages, food trucks, license to sell for public consumption authorized, Sec. 28-3A-17.1 added.
Title
Class 1 municipality (B'ham), alcoholic beverages, food trucks, license to sell for public consumption authorized, Sec. 28-3A-17.1 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Rafferty motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 89 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 953 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 952 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 212 (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 211 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Rafferty motion to Adopt Roll Call 210 (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 953 (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 952 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 951 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 212 (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 211 (Y: 79 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - HBIR: Rafferty motion to Adopt Roll Call 210 (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Tourism first Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-432. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Rafferty motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 951 |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 953 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 952 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2022-02-16 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 212 |
2022-02-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 211 |
2022-02-16 | House | Rafferty Amendment Offered |
2022-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |