AL HB234 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Forwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, abandoned, contests, notice of appeal required to be filed in circuit court in county where sale is scheduled, Tax Tribunal, not subject to declaratory judgment, declaratory ruling, or contested case provisions of Admin. Procedure Act, Sec. 40-2B-1.1 added; Sec. 32-13-4 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, abandoned, contests, notice of appeal required to be filed in circuit court in county where sale is scheduled, Tax Tribunal, not subject to declaratory judgment, declaratory ruling, or contested case provisions of Admin. Procedure Act, Sec. 40-2B-1.1 added; Sec. 32-13-4 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseForwarded to Governor on May 19, 2017 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-441.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2017-05-19HouseFaulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1017
2017-05-19HouseConcurrence Requested
2017-05-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1166
2017-05-17SenateScofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1165
2017-05-17SenateScofield Amendment Offered
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-04-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2017-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 626
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-03-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2017-02-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB234&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2017RS/PrintFiles/HB234-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=571169&VOTE=626&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=558958&VOTE=47&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577403&VOTE=1165&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=577404&VOTE=1166&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=578880&VOTE=1017&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1068&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback