AL HB233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Voter registration, procedures to maintain voter registration database revised, Sec. 17-4-30 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration, procedures to maintain voter registration database revised, Sec. 17-4-30 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 70 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Holmes motion to Table (Y: 71 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Gray's amendment (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Gray motion to remove his amendment from the table (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Holmes motion to Table (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed
2019-04-23HouseAlexander Amendment again taken up
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Adopt Gray's amendment adopted Roll Call 342
2019-04-23HouseSouth intended to vote "Yea"
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344
2019-04-23HouseGray motion to remove his amendment from the table adopted Roll Call 341
2019-04-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 340
2019-04-23HouseHolmes motion to Table adopted Roll Call 343
2019-04-23HouseHolmes motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-23HouseAlexander Amendment Offered
2019-04-23HouseRogers Amendment Offered
2019-04-23HouseHolmes motion to Table adopted Roll Call 305
2019-04-23HouseGray Amendment Offered
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-20HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB233&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB233-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB233-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199773-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199777-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199780-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612150&VOTE=305&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612373&VOTE=340&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612375&VOTE=341&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612376&VOTE=342&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612520&VOTE=343&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=612533&VOTE=344&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback