AL HB232 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substance database, access by medical examiners, coroners, and deputy coroners, in certain circumstances, Sec. 20-2-214 am'd.
Title
Controlled substance database, access by medical examiners, coroners, and deputy coroners, in certain circumstances, Sec. 20-2-214 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1022 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 160 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 159 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Bedsole motion to Adopt Roll Call 158 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 160 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 159 (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Bedsole motion to Adopt Roll Call 158 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-384. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-15 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-15 | House | Hall intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160 |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 159 |
2022-02-15 | House | Bedsole Amendment Offered |
2022-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |