AL HB232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 2 mun. (Mobile), municipal ordinances, all courts of this state to take judicial notice, Sec. 11-45-11 am'd.
Title
Class 2 mun. (Mobile), municipal ordinances, all courts of this state to take judicial notice, Sec. 11-45-11 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1448 (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1447 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 677 (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 676 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1447 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 677 (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 676 (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 26) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 8:34 p.m. on May 17, 2021. |
2021-05-17 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-501. |
2021-05-17 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1448 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 677 |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |