AL HB232 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Williams motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Williams motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Controlled substances, persons licensed to distribute or dispense, expert testimony required for prosecution, fines, Secs. 20-2-58, 20-2-71 am'd.
Title
Controlled substances, persons licensed to distribute or dispense, expert testimony required for prosecution, fines, Secs. 20-2-58, 20-2-71 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Williams motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Williams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 761 |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 760 |
2018-03-13 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 759 |
2018-03-13 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2018-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2018-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |