AL HB232 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Security Regulatory Board, licensure of security guards and officers, fees increased, criminal history background checks, exemptions for certain individuals and entities removed, Secs. 34-27C-3, 34-27C-4, 34-27C-7, 34-27C-14, 34-27C-17 am'd.
Title
Security Regulatory Board, licensure of security guards and officers, fees increased, criminal history background checks, exemptions for certain individuals and entities removed, Secs. 34-27C-3, 34-27C-4, 34-27C-7, 34-27C-14, 34-27C-17 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mac Buttram [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - McMillan motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Buttram motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 82 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - McMillan motion to Adopt (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - Buttram motion to Table (Y: 15 N: 54 NV: 4 Abs: 30) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-349. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1089 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2013-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 302 |
2013-04-04 | House | McMillan motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 301 |
2013-04-04 | House | Buttram motion to Table lost Roll Call 300 |
2013-04-04 | House | McMillan Amendment Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 299 |
2013-04-04 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-12 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |