AL HB231 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Title
Coalition Against Domestic Violence, appropriation, operations plan and audited financial statement required, quarterly and end-of-year reports required
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-20 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-327. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1030 |
2014-04-01 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1050 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1049 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-02-26 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 436 |
2014-02-26 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 435 |
2014-02-26 | House | Clouse Amendment Offered |
2014-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |