AL HB230 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Correction Dept., female inmates, prohibited practices regarding treatment of pregnant female inmates or female inmates in postpartum period
Title
Correction Dept., female inmates, prohibited practices regarding treatment of pregnant female inmates or female inmates in postpartum period
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Hollis motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1024 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1085 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1084 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 747 (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 746 (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 745 (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Hollis motion to Adopt Roll Call 744 (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1085 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1084 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 747 (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 746 (Y: 82 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 745 (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Hollis motion to Adopt Roll Call 744 (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-440. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | House | Hollis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1024 |
2022-04-07 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1085 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Singleton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1084 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Singleton Amendment Offered |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Robbins intended to vote "Abstain" |
2022-03-29 | House | Robbins intended to vote "Abstain" |
2022-03-29 | House | Robbins intended to vote "Abstain" |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 747 |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 746 |
2022-03-29 | House | Hall Amendment Offered |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745 |
2022-03-29 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |