AL HB230 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Corporations, AL Business and Nonprofit Entities Code, amended to clarify relationship between chapters and various sections in Title 10A, Secs. 10A-1-5.18, 10A-2A-2.01,10A-2A-8.30, 10A-2A-8.31, 10A-2A-8.42, 10A-2A-8.43, 10A-2A-8.59, 10A-2A-9.01, 10A-2A-10.06, 10A-2A-10.07, 10A-2A-10.08, 10A-2A-11.01, 10A-2A-13.01, 10A-2A-16.01,10A-3-1.05, 10A-8A-4.10, 10A-8A-8.06, 10A-8A-8.09, 10A-8A-8.10, 10A-8A-9.01 added; Secs 10A-1-1.02, 10A-1-1.03, and 10A-1-4.02, 10A-2A-1.40,10A-2A-1.41, 10A-2A-2.02,10A-2A-7.20, 10A-3-1.02, 10A-3-2.02, 10A-3-2.03, 10A-3-2.09, 10A-3-2.21, 10A-5A-1.02, 10A-5A-2.01, 10A-5A-2.02, 10A-5A-7.02, 10A-5A-7.04, 10A-5A-7.05, 10A-5A-7.06, 10A-5A-7.07, 10A-5A-11.10, 10A-5A-11.12, 10A-5A-11.13, 10A-5A-11.14, 10A-5A-11.15, 10A-8A-1.02, 10A-8A-8.02, 10A-8A-8.07, 10A-9A-1.02, 10A-9A-2.01, 10A-9A-2.02, 10A-9A-4.06, 10A-9A-4.07, 10A-9A-8.02, 10A-9A-8.06, 10A-9A-8.07, 10A-9A-8.09, 10A-9A-8.10, 10A-9A-10.01 am'd.
Title
Corporations, AL Business and Nonprofit Entities Code, amended to clarify relationship between chapters and various sections in Title 10A, Secs. 10A-1-5.18, 10A-2A-2.01,10A-2A-8.30, 10A-2A-8.31, 10A-2A-8.42, 10A-2A-8.43, 10A-2A-8.59, 10A-2A-9.01, 10A-2A-10.06, 10A-2A-10.07, 10A-2A-10.08, 10A-2A-11.01, 10A-2A-13.01, 10A-2A-16.01,10A-3-1.05, 10A-8A-4.10, 10A-8A-8.06, 10A-8A-8.09, 10A-8A-8.10, 10A-8A-9.01 added; Secs 10A-1-1.02, 10A-1-1.03, and 10A-1-4.02, 10A-2A-1.40,10A-2A-1.41, 10A-2A-2.02,10A-2A-7.20, 10A-3-1.02, 10A-3-2.02, 10A-3-2.03, 10A-3-2.09, 10A-3-2.21, 10A-5A-1.02, 10A-5A-2.01, 10A-5A-2.02, 10A-5A-7.02, 10A-5A-7.04, 10A-5A-7.05, 10A-5A-7.06, 10A-5A-7.07, 10A-5A-11.10, 10A-5A-11.12, 10A-5A-11.13, 10A-5A-11.14, 10A-5A-11.15, 10A-8A-1.02, 10A-8A-8.02, 10A-8A-8.07, 10A-9A-1.02, 10A-9A-2.01, 10A-9A-2.02, 10A-9A-4.06, 10A-9A-4.07, 10A-9A-8.02, 10A-9A-8.06, 10A-9A-8.07, 10A-9A-8.09, 10A-9A-8.10, 10A-9A-10.01 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB96 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Assigned Act No. 2021-299.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10A | 1 | 1.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 1.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 4.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 1 | 5.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 1.40 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 1.41 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 10.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 10.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 10.08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 11.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 13.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 16.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 2.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 2.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 7.20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 8.30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 8.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 8.59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 2A | 9.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 1.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 1.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 2.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 2.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 2.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 3 | 2.21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 1.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 11.10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 11.12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 11.13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 11.14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 11.15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 2.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 2.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 7.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 7.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 7.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 7.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 5A | 7.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 1.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 4.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 8.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 8.06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 8.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 8.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 8.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 8A | 9.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 1.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 10.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 2.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 2.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 4.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 4.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 8.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 8.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 8.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 8.09 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
10A | 9A | 8.10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |