AL HB23 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Pending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

University of North Alabama, Board of Trustees, revised to replace State Superintendent of Ed with at-large member, districts amended to reflect current congressional districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of North Alabama, Board of Trustees, revised to replace State Superintendent of Ed with at-large member, districts amended to reflect current congressional districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenatePending third reading on day 9 Favorable from Education and Youth Affairs
2018-02-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
2018-01-25HouseEngrossed
2018-01-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 109
2018-01-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 108
2018-01-25HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2018-01-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB23&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB23-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB23-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189617-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189714-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583315&VOTE=108&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=583317&VOTE=109&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=591576&VOTE=547&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback