AL HB23 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-24 - Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Natural gas, compressed and liquefied, used as motor vehicle fuel, decals from Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board extended to May 1, 2017, suspension of motor fuel tax extended, Sec. 40-17-167 am'd.
Title
Natural gas, compressed and liquefied, used as motor vehicle fuel, decals from Liquefied Petroleum Gas Board extended to May 1, 2017, suspension of motor fuel tax extended, Sec. 40-17-167 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Johnson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-17 - House - Johnson (K) motion to Table (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:47 a.m. on August 24, 2016. |
2016-08-24 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-468. |
2016-08-24 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-08-23 | House | Enrolled |
2016-08-23 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-08-17 | House | Engrossed |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29 |
2016-08-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28 |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 51 |
2016-08-17 | House | Johnson (K) Amendment Offered |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-17 | House | Johnson (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 27 |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism and Marketing |
2016-08-17 | House | Ways and Means General Fund Amendment Offered |
2016-08-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-08-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-08-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |