AL HB228 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Advanced Practice Nurses, Loan-Repayment Program established for, to pay for education of, Secs. 34-21-94 to 34-21-99, inclusive, added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advanced Practice Nurses, Loan-Repayment Program established for, to pay for education of, Secs. 34-21-94 to 34-21-99, inclusive, added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Weaver motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Reed motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseEngrossed
2016-05-04HouseForwarded to Governor at 4:09 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-353.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseWeaver motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 847
2016-05-04HouseConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 965
2016-05-04SenateReed motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 964
2016-05-04SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2016-03-23HouseEngrossed
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 425
2016-03-23HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 424
2016-03-23HouseWays and Means Education Amendment Offered
2016-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-16HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB228
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB228-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542944&VOTE=424&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=542945&VOTE=425&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551856&VOTE=964&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551857&VOTE=965&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552051&VOTE=847&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback