AL HB228 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition (PACT) Program, separate board of directors, members, duties, annual appropriations from Education Trust Fund to PACT Fund based on a formula for fiscal years for certain period of time, dissolution of PACT Program, Sec. 16-33C-4.1 added; Secs. 16-33C-3, 16-33C-4, 16-33C-5, 16-33C-6, 16-33C-7, 16-33C-8, 16-33C-10, 16-33C-11, 16-33C-12 am'd.; Sec. 16-33C-9 repealed
Title
Prepaid Affordable College Tuition (PACT) Program, separate board of directors, members, duties, annual appropriations from Education Trust Fund to PACT Fund based on a formula for fiscal years for certain period of time, dissolution of PACT Program, Sec. 16-33C-4.1 added; Secs. 16-33C-3, 16-33C-4, 16-33C-5, 16-33C-6, 16-33C-7, 16-33C-8, 16-33C-10, 16-33C-11, 16-33C-12 am'd.; Sec. 16-33C-9 repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] | Rep. Butch Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-02-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Ford motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Ford motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt committee substitute (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Hubbard motion to Table committee substitute (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2010-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Ford motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Ford motion to Table (Y: 52 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt committee substitute (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Hubbard motion to Table committee substitute (Y: 30 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2010-02-25 | Engrossed | |
2010-02-25 | Cosponsors Added | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 426 | |
2010-02-25 | Ford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 425 | |
2010-02-25 | Hubbard 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-25 | Thigpen intended to vote "Yea" | |
2010-02-25 | Ford motion to Table adopted Roll Call 424 | |
2010-02-25 | Hubbard 1st Amendment Offered | |
2010-02-25 | Motion to Adopt committee substitute adopted Roll Call 423 | |
2010-02-25 | Shiver intended to vote "Yea" | |
2010-02-25 | Hubbard motion to Table committee substitute lost Roll Call 422 | |
2010-02-25 | Education Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Appropriations |