AL HB227 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, removal of child or incapacitated person from locked vehicle, immunity under certain conditions
Title
Motor vehicles, removal of child or incapacitated person from locked vehicle, immunity under certain conditions
Sponsors
Rep. John Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017. |
2017-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on May 2, 2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-241. |
2017-05-02 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 756 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 373 |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |