AL HB227 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-08 - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 243
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education
Title
Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology Fund to the Department of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 243 |
2016-03-08 | House | Executive Amendment Offered |
2016-03-08 | House | Forwarded to Governor |
2016-03-08 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-03-08 | House | Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 219 |
2016-03-08 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 267 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Dial Amendment Offered |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2016-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53 |
2016-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |