AL HB224 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-04 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, tax credits for certain capital contributions to small businesses in Alabama, established, Dept. of Commerce to administer, Alabama Small Business Investment Company Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, tax credits for certain capital contributions to small businesses in Alabama, established, Dept. of Commerce to administer, Alabama Small Business Investment Company Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04SenateFurther Consideration
2016-05-04SenateFinance and Taxation Education first Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-05-04SenateWilliams motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-04-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2016-04-05HouseEngrossed
2016-04-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 501
2016-04-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 500
2016-04-05HouseCollins Amendment Offered
2016-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback