AL HB223 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2016 First Special Session, 2017 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Title
Code of Alabama 1975, Acts of 2016 First Special Session, 2017 Regular Session, supplements and certain replacement volumes, codified with certain corrections, local laws of certain counties codified, duties of Secretary of State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 20 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2018-03-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 606 |
2018-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |