AL HB222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child support, employers who protects the wages of an employee from child support withholding, personally liable for the debt, Sec. 30-3-69.1 added
Title
Child support, employers who protects the wages of an employee from child support withholding, personally liable for the debt, Sec. 30-3-69.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:30 a.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-365. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1399 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 376 |
2015-04-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 375 |
2015-04-14 | House | Judiciary Amendment Offered |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |