AL HB220 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend Section 17-3-8, Code of Alabama 1975, as last amended by Act 2022-112 of the 2022 Regular Session, relating to meeting days of boards of registrars; to increase the number of working days that the Shelby County Board of Registrars may meet each week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend Section 17-3-8, Code of Alabama 1975, as last amended by Act 2022-112 of the 2022 Regular Session, relating to meeting days of boards of registrars; to increase the number of working days that the Shelby County Board of Registrars may meet each week.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-01 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-01HouseEnacted
2023-06-01HouseEnrolled
2023-06-01SenateReady to Enroll
2023-06-01SenateRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-06-01SenateOn Third Reading in Second House
2023-05-24SenateRead Second Time in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Out of Committee in Second House
2023-05-24SenateReported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-05-11SenateReferred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund
2023-05-11HouseRead First Time in Second House
2023-05-09HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-09HouseRead a Third Time and Pass
2023-05-09HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-04-27HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-04-26HouseReported Favorably from House Ways and Means General Fund
2023-03-23HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Ways and Means General Fund
2023-03-23HouseRead First Time in House of Origin

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback