AL HB220 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Literacy Act, definitions further provided, membership and duties of the Literacy Task Force, duties and functioning of the Alabama Committee on Grade Level Reading, Secs. 16-6G-2 to 16-6G-5, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Literacy Act, definitions further provided, membership and duties of the Literacy Task Force, duties and functioning of the Alabama Committee on Grade Level Reading, Secs. 16-6G-2 to 16-6G-5, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 923 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 921 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 290 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 289 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 288 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 287 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 922 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 921 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 290 (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 289 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 288 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 287 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022. |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-392. |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-05 | House | Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Voice Vote 921 |
2022-04-05 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 922 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-02-23 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 290 |
2022-02-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 289 |
2022-02-23 | House | Drummond Amendment Offered |
2022-02-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 288 |
2022-02-23 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2022-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 6G | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 6G | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 6G | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 6G | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |