AL HB220 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Captive Insurance Companies, insurance in alien jurisdictions auth., requirements for an Alabama Coastal Captive Insurance Company revised, certificate of dormancy provided for, Secs. 27-31B-26, 27-31C-3.1 added; Sec. 27-31C-4 repealed; Secs. 27-31B-2, 27-31B-3, 37-31B-6, 27-31C-3 am'd.
Title
Captive Insurance Companies, insurance in alien jurisdictions auth., requirements for an Alabama Coastal Captive Insurance Company revised, certificate of dormancy provided for, Secs. 27-31B-26, 27-31C-3.1 added; Sec. 27-31C-4 repealed; Secs. 27-31B-2, 27-31B-3, 37-31B-6, 27-31C-3 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Banking and Insurance |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2020-02-25 | House | Engrossed |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 116 |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 115 |
2020-02-25 | House | Insurance Amendment Offered |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2020-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |