AL HB220 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crimes and offenses, manslaughter, death resulting from unlawful sale of a controlled substance, Sec. 13A-6-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes and offenses, manslaughter, death resulting from unlawful sale of a controlled substance, Sec. 13A-6-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenatePending third reading on day 27 Favorable from Judiciary
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2019-05-23HouseCosponsors Added
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 994
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback