AL HB22 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Assigned Act No. 2018-152.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Boards, commissions, committees, task forces, authorities, inactive or inoperable, abolished, Secs. 22-1-12, 22-23A-3, 41-23-23 am'd; Secs. 2-13A-1, 2-13A-2, 4-2A-1 to 4-2A-23, inclusive, 9-6A-1 to 9-6A-10, inclusive, 9-12-142, 9-13-25, 14-1-18, 16-25A-13, 16-55-20 to 16-55-24, inclusive, 22-4A-1 to 22-4A-7, inclusive, 22-18-20 to 22-18-23, inclusive, 22-30E-12, 22-50-25, 24-10-8, 24-10-9, 29-2-220 to 29-2-228, inclusive, 32-3-1 to 32-3-7, inclusive, 36-21-140 to 36-21-142, inclusive, 36-36-10, 38-7A-1 to 38-7A-4, inclusive, 40-23-242, 41-9-190 to 41-9-196, inclusive, 41-9-490 to 41-9-498, inclusive, 41-9-570 to 41-9-574, inclusive, 41-9-780 to 41-9-787, inclusive, 41-9-830 to 41-9-833, inclusive, 41-10-200 to 41-10-215, inclusive, 41-25-1 to 41-25-5 inclusive repealed; Acts 1975-1178, Act 1979-43, Act 1985-138, Act 1985-280, Act 1985-301, Act 1985-811, Act 1987-02, Act 1988-213, Act 1991-259, Act 1991-325, Act 1992-56, Act 1994-764, Act 1996-289, Act 1997-68, Act 1997-818, Act 1998-107, Act 1998-156, Act 2000-8, Act 2001-62, Act 2002-318, Act 2004-421, Act 2004-540, Act 2005-257, Act 2006-430, Act 2007-171, Act 2007-421, Act 2007-507, Act 2007-565, Act 2007-592, Act 2008-25, Act 2008-121, Act 2008-337, Act 2008-386, Act 2009-142, Act 2009-180, Act 2009-794, Act 2009-798, Act 2009-806, Act 2010-458, Act 2010-638, Act 2011-132, Act 2011-356, Act 2012-25, Act 2012-597, Act 2014-194 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Boards, commissions, committees, task forces, authorities, inactive or inoperable, abolished, Secs. 22-1-12, 22-23A-3, 41-23-23 am'd; Secs. 2-13A-1, 2-13A-2, 4-2A-1 to 4-2A-23, inclusive, 9-6A-1 to 9-6A-10, inclusive, 9-12-142, 9-13-25, 14-1-18, 16-25A-13, 16-55-20 to 16-55-24, inclusive, 22-4A-1 to 22-4A-7, inclusive, 22-18-20 to 22-18-23, inclusive, 22-30E-12, 22-50-25, 24-10-8, 24-10-9, 29-2-220 to 29-2-228, inclusive, 32-3-1 to 32-3-7, inclusive, 36-21-140 to 36-21-142, inclusive, 36-36-10, 38-7A-1 to 38-7A-4, inclusive, 40-23-242, 41-9-190 to 41-9-196, inclusive, 41-9-490 to 41-9-498, inclusive, 41-9-570 to 41-9-574, inclusive, 41-9-780 to 41-9-787, inclusive, 41-9-830 to 41-9-833, inclusive, 41-10-200 to 41-10-215, inclusive, 41-25-1 to 41-25-5 inclusive repealed; Acts 1975-1178, Act 1979-43, Act 1985-138, Act 1985-280, Act 1985-301, Act 1985-811, Act 1987-02, Act 1988-213, Act 1991-259, Act 1991-325, Act 1992-56, Act 1994-764, Act 1996-289, Act 1997-68, Act 1997-818, Act 1998-107, Act 1998-156, Act 2000-8, Act 2001-62, Act 2002-318, Act 2004-421, Act 2004-540, Act 2005-257, Act 2006-430, Act 2007-171, Act 2007-421, Act 2007-507, Act 2007-565, Act 2007-592, Act 2008-25, Act 2008-121, Act 2008-337, Act 2008-386, Act 2009-142, Act 2009-180, Act 2009-794, Act 2009-798, Act 2009-806, Act 2010-458, Act 2010-638, Act 2011-132, Act 2011-356, Act 2012-25, Act 2012-597, Act 2014-194 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-152.
2018-02-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:16 p.m. on February 27, 2018.
2018-02-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-02-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-02-22HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22HousePassed Second House
2018-02-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 478
2018-02-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-02-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-08SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2018-02-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234
2018-02-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback