AL HB22 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stored wire and electronic communications, transactional location records, pen registers, and trap and trace devices, federal law to be followed regarding these devices, use of such devices authorized in emergency situations relating to missing persons
Title
Stored wire and electronic communications, transactional location records, pen registers, and trap and trace devices, federal law to be followed regarding these devices, use of such devices authorized in emergency situations relating to missing persons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Indefinitely Postponed | |
2011-05-31 | England motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-03-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |