AL HB218 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, public elementary school, instruction in handwriting, cursive writing by end of third grade year, Sec. 16-6B-2 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, public elementary school, instruction in handwriting, cursive writing by end of third grade year, Sec. 16-6B-2 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-352 on 05/11/2016.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04HousePassed Second House
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 970
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
2016-05-03SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-04-12HouseEngrossed
2016-04-12HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 568
2016-04-12HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 567
2016-04-12HouseFincher Amendment Offered
2016-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback