AL HB218 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison County, (Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit) of Alabama, Pretrial Diversion Program, fees further provided for, Act 94-392, 1994 Reg. Sess., am'd
Title
Madison County, (Twenty-Third Judicial Circuit) of Alabama, Pretrial Diversion Program, fees further provided for, Act 94-392, 1994 Reg. Sess., am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] | Rep. Jim Patterson [R] |
Rep. Howard Sanderford [R] | Rep. Phil Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Keahey to adopt BIR (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
2012-05-09 - Senate - Keahey to adopt BIR (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 25) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Delivered to Governor at 4:42 p. m. on May 8, 2012. | |
2012-05-08 | Assigned Act No. 2012-361. | |
2012-05-08 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-08 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-08 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1106 | |
2012-05-08 | Keahey to adopt BIR adopted Roll Call 1105 | |
2012-05-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Orr motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-28 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 4 | |
2012-02-23 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 87 | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-16 | Rereferred from Local Legislation to Madison County Legislation | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |