AL HB215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Volunteer fire depts., certification by Forestry Commission, minimum standards for equipment, decertification authorized, rules re certification and decertification authorized, Sec. 9-3-17am'd.
Title
Volunteer fire depts., certification by Forestry Commission, minimum standards for equipment, decertification authorized, rules re certification and decertification authorized, Sec. 9-3-17am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-03 - House - Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Pittman motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-351. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-03 | House | Baker motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 833 |
2016-05-03 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 954 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Pittman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 953 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Pittman first Substitute Offered |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2016-03-23 | House | Engrossed |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 422 |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 421 |
2016-03-23 | House | Baker Amendment Offered |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |