AL HB215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, license tags and distinctive license tags, issuance further provided for through Revenue Department, commitments, National Guard tags, distribution of money to foundation, motorcycle tags, out-of-state college tags, retired volunteer firefighters tags, tags honoring law enforcement officers killed in line of duty, heavy truck tags, renewal procedures for license tags, driver's license required for only one party, Secs. 32-6-58, 32-6-64, 32-6-67, 32-6-68, 32-6-111.2, 32-6-270, 32-6-272, 32-7A-17 am'd; Sec. 40-12-267 repealed
Title
Motor vehicles, license tags and distinctive license tags, issuance further provided for through Revenue Department, commitments, National Guard tags, distribution of money to foundation, motorcycle tags, out-of-state college tags, retired volunteer firefighters tags, tags honoring law enforcement officers killed in line of duty, heavy truck tags, renewal procedures for license tags, driver's license required for only one party, Secs. 32-6-58, 32-6-64, 32-6-67, 32-6-68, 32-6-111.2, 32-6-270, 32-6-272, 32-7A-17 am'd; Sec. 40-12-267 repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-398. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2013-05-20 | House | DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1255 |
2013-05-20 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1076 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Dial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1075 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Dial first Substitute Offered |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2013-04-10 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 369 |
2013-04-10 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 368 |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |