AL HB214 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile Co., revenue commissioner, duties transferred from judge of probate, legislative intent clarified, Act 2015-265, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Title
Mobile Co., revenue commissioner, duties transferred from judge of probate, legislative intent clarified, Act 2015-265, 2015 Reg. Sess., am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019. |
2019-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-157. |
2019-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 527 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2019-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 234 |
2019-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-19 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |