AL HB213 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Volunteer Rescue Squad Tuition Reimbursement Act of 2018; to amend Sections 22-18-60, 22-18-61, 22-18-63, and 22-18-64, Code of Alabama 1975, to decrease the required contracted for service time after graduation and licensing from three years to two years; to expand the program to include students who contract and provide service to ambulance services; to provide exclusions from reimbursement; and to increase the amount of operational expenses reimbursed to the Alabama Community College System; and to add Section 22-18-61.1 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide for the retroactive reimbursement of certain fees and expenses.
Title
Relating to the Volunteer Rescue Squad Tuition Reimbursement Act of 2018; to amend Sections 22-18-60, 22-18-61, 22-18-63, and 22-18-64, Code of Alabama 1975, to decrease the required contracted for service time after graduation and licensing from three years to two years; to expand the program to include students who contract and provide service to ambulance services; to provide exclusions from reimbursement; and to increase the amount of operational expenses reimbursed to the Alabama Community College System; and to add Section 22-18-61.1 to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide for the retroactive reimbursement of certain fees and expenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Lovvorn [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Adopt GNQXCC-1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Adopt GNQXCC-1 (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-24 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-03 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-02 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Adopt GNQXCC-1 |
2023-05-02 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-27 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-26 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |