AL HB213 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mobile County, county treasurer, office abolished, duties transferred to county commission
Title
Mobile County, county treasurer, office abolished, duties transferred to county commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 400 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 399 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 237 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 236 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Figures motion to Adopt Roll Call 399 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 237 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 68 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-02-17 - House - HBIR: Drummond motion to Adopt Roll Call 236 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 48 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022. |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-95. |
2022-03-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 400 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Mobile County Legislation |
2022-02-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 237 |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Mobile County Legislation |