AL HB213 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Campaign finance, time by which contribution and expenditures must be reported day before an election revised, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Campaign finance, time by which contribution and expenditures must be reported day before an election revised, Sec. 17-5-8 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Givan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on May 31, 2019.
2019-05-31HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-31HouseEnrolled
2019-05-31SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-31SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2019-05-30HouseGivan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1249
2019-05-30HouseConcurrence Requested
2019-05-30SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1431
2019-05-30SenateMarsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1430
2019-05-30SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2019-05-30SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-29SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-28SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
2019-05-23HouseMooney and Givan intended to vote "Yea"
2019-05-23HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 989
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics and Campaign Finance

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB213&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB213-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB213-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202308-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=623602&VOTE=989&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627119&VOTE=1430&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627120&VOTE=1431&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627162&VOTE=1249&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback