AL HB212 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prattville, taxation, distribution of certain sales and use tax proceeds revised, Elmore County Commission to remit certain lodging tax proceeds to the City of Prattville, Secs. 45-1A-43, 45-26-246.05 am'd.
Title
Prattville, taxation, distribution of certain sales and use tax proceeds revised, Elmore County Commission to remit certain lodging tax proceeds to the City of Prattville, Secs. 45-1A-43, 45-26-246.05 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Reed Ingram [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 88 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Ingram motion to Adopt Roll Call 87 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-02-09 - House - HBIR: Ingram motion to Adopt Roll Call 87 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 56 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 88 |
2022-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB139 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Assigned Act No. 2022-49.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | 1A | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 26 | 246.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |