AL HB212 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motorcycles, licensure of operators, testing and safety courses by Alabama Law Enforcement Agency and the Alabama Traffic Safety Center, for Class M designation and license; add'l requirements for minors, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-240, 32-12-22 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motorcycles, licensure of operators, testing and safety courses by Alabama Law Enforcement Agency and the Alabama Traffic Safety Center, for Class M designation and license; add'l requirements for minors, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-240, 32-12-22 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 61) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-21HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
2015-05-21HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-223.
2015-05-21HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-05-21SenateSignature Requested
2015-05-19HouseEnrolled
2015-05-19HousePassed Second House
2015-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1033
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-04-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-04-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
2015-04-14HouseEngrossed
2015-04-14HouseCosponsors Added
2015-04-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 370
2015-04-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 369
2015-04-14HouseJones Amendment Offered
2015-04-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 368
2015-04-14HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
2015-04-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-03-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-03-10HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB212
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB212-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB212-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015RS/PrintFiles/HB212-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=510229&VOTE=368&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=510231&VOTE=369&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=510232&VOTE=370&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=510240&VOTE=373&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=519318&VOTE=1033&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1064&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback