AL HB211 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid, inmates in county jails and under juvenile court, Medicaid eligibility suspended, not terminated, temporary reinstatement for medical care, payment of court
Title
Medicaid, inmates in county jails and under juvenile court, Medicaid eligibility suspended, not terminated, temporary reinstatement for medical care, payment of court
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:56 p.m. on May 3, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-298. |
2017-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 837 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2017-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 197 |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 196 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ways and Means General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |