AL HB210 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2015 at 4:34 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-26 - Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2015 at 4:34 p.m. on May 26, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative Procedure Act, rules, approval and disapproval by Joint Legislative Committee, procedures, appeal of disapproval to Lt. Gov., Act 2014-457, 2014 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 41-22-24 repealed; Secs. 41-22-5, 41-22-5.1, 41-22-6, 41-22-22, 41-22-23 am'd.
Title
Administrative Procedure Act, rules, approval and disapproval by Joint Legislative Committee, procedures, appeal of disapproval to Lt. Gov., Act 2014-457, 2014 Reg. Sess., am'd; Sec. 41-22-24 repealed; Secs. 41-22-5, 41-22-5.1, 41-22-6, 41-22-22, 41-22-23 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-26 | House | Forwarded to Governor on May 26, 2015 at 4:34 p.m. on May 26, 2015. |
2015-05-26 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-291. |
2015-05-26 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-26 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1111 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2015-05-12 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 674 |
2015-05-12 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Internal Affairs |