AL HB21 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement of members of the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, option to elect to receive a partial lump-sum distribution as a single payment and reduce retirement allowance, provided for under certain conditions, Secs. 16-25-14 & 36-27-16 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement of members of the Teachers' Retirement System and the Employees' Retirement System, option to elect to receive a partial lump-sum distribution as a single payment and reduce retirement allowance, provided for under certain conditions, Secs. 16-25-14 & 36-27-16 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseForwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
2019-05-23HouseAssigned Act No. 2019-316.
2019-05-23HouseClerk of the House Certification
2019-05-23HouseEnrolled
2019-05-23SenateSignature Requested
2019-05-23HousePassed Second House
2019-05-23SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1097
2019-05-23SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-08SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-04-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2019-04-04HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 130
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback