AL HB21 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, Secs. 9-11-244, 9-11-245 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hunting, authorize the taking of whitetail deer or feral swine by means of bait, Secs. 9-11-244, 9-11-245 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 79 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28SenateFurther Consideration
2018-03-28SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-28SenateRules Committee Petition to Cease Debate lost Roll Call 1223
2018-03-28SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-20SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-20SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-03-01SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry
2018-02-22HouseEngrossed
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 437
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 436
2018-02-22HouseIngram Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 435
2018-02-22HouseAgriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2018-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB21&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB21-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB21-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189813-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191793-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590285&VOTE=435&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590287&VOTE=436&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=590288&VOTE=437&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602076&VOTE=1223&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback