AL HB21 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Delivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on August 7, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Walker County, Treasurers office abolished, duties transferred to co. commission, Act 404, 1966 Sp. Sess., Act 85-896, 1985 2nd. Sp. Sess., 89-634, 1989 Reg. Sess., repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Walker County, Treasurers office abolished, duties transferred to co. commission, Act 404, 1966 Sp. Sess., Act 85-896, 1985 2nd. Sp. Sess., 89-634, 1989 Reg. Sess., repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 18) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-07HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:31 p.m. on August 7, 2015.
2015-08-07HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-517.
2015-08-07SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-07HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-07HouseEnrolled
2015-08-07HousePassed Second House
2015-08-07SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 47
2015-08-07SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-05SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback