AL HB209 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - Read Second Time in Second House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to voting; to prohibit any person from distributing, ordering, requesting, collecting, completing, obtaining, or delivering an absentee ballot application or absentee ballot of another person in certain circumstances; to provide for exceptions; to prohibit a person from receiving a payment or providing a payment to another person for distributing, ordering, requesting, collecting, completing, obtaining, or delivering an absentee ballot application or absentee ballot of another person in certain circumstance; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to voting; to prohibit any person from distributing, ordering, requesting, collecting, completing, obtaining, or delivering an absentee ballot application or absentee ballot of another person in certain circumstances; to provide for exceptions; to prohibit a person from receiving a payment or providing a payment to another person for distributing, ordering, requesting, collecting, completing, obtaining, or delivering an absentee ballot application or absentee ballot of another person in certain circumstance; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt WP3Y95-1 (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Previous Question (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Adopt WP3Y95-1 (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - House - Previous Question (Y: 77 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate State Governmental Affairs TSEI91-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-04 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-04 | House | Adopt WP3Y95-1 |
2023-05-04 | House | Previous Question |
2023-05-04 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |
2023-04-19 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections WP3Y95-1 |
2023-04-17 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Constitution, Campaigns and Elections 4LJ7II-1 |
2023-03-23 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |