AL HB209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Hearing: May 21 @ 1:45 pm in Room 825 ***TIME CHANGE and Public Hearing added for HB 209*
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Education, school resource officers, qualifications further provided for, Sec. 16-1-44.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education, school resource officers, qualifications further provided for, Sec. 16-1-44.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 41 N: 39 NV: 14 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
2019-05-15HouseEngrossed
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 748
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 747
2019-05-15HouseRobertson Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 746
2019-05-15HouseBracy Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 745
2019-05-15HouseStandridge Amendment Offered
2019-05-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-03-19HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB209&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB209-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199827-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/199587-8.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/201392-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619842&VOTE=745&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619844&VOTE=746&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619850&VOTE=747&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=619851&VOTE=748&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback