AL HB209 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Daphne, corp. limits, alt.
Title
Daphne, corp. limits, alt.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on April 13, 2017. |
2017-04-13 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-163. |
2017-04-13 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 510 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2017-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 182 |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |