AL HB208 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pistol permits, active member of U.S. Armed Forces and an honorably discharged veteran, issuance without payment of fee, Sec. 13A-11-75.1 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pistol permits, active member of U.S. Armed Forces and an honorably discharged veteran, issuance without payment of fee, Sec. 13A-11-75.1 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenatePending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Veterans and Military Affairs with 1 amendment
2020-03-12SenateVeterans and Military Affairs first Amendment Offered
2020-03-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2020-02-27SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2020-02-25HouseEngrossed
2020-02-25HouseMooney intended to vote "Yea"
2020-02-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 129
2020-02-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 128
2020-02-25HouseStandridge Amendment Offered
2020-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2020-02-20HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2020-02-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB208&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB208-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/HB208-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/205639-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2020RS/PrintFiles/206451-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=632503&VOTE=128&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=632585&VOTE=129&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1076&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback